EP0223316 - Circuit arrangement for producing a DC voltage from an AC input voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albach, Manfred, Dr. Hasbach 5 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Wegener, Armin Kleinmarschierstrasse 61 D-5100 Aachen / DE | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Hartmann, Heinrich, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Hartmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86202051.8 | 20.11.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | DE19853541307 | 22.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3541307 | [1987/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0223316 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0223316 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223316 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/156 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M3/156 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/22] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung einer Gleichspannung aus einer sinusförmigen Eingangsspannung | [1987/22] | English: | Circuit arrangement for producing a DC voltage from an AC input voltage | [1987/22] | French: | Disposition de circuit pour produire une tension continue à partir d'une tension d'entrée sinusoidale | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 29.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2652275 (BOEHRINGER ANDREAS); | [AD]US4190882 (CHEVALIER ARTHUR C [US], et al); | [A]GB2147159 (MINITRONICS PTY LTD) |