EP0227148 - A method of sharing duplex channels in an automatic channel selection system and an automatic channel selection system in which this method is applied [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.1991 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Jager, Johan Bernard C/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Reynders, John Richard C/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Bakker, Hendrik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1987/27] | Vermeulen, Hermanus Gerardus Jacobus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 86202122.7 | 28.11.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | NL19850003382 | 09.12.1985 Original published format: NL 8503382 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227148 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/02, H04B7/26, H04M1/72 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
H04M1/72511 (EP,US);
H04B7/2621 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufteilung von Duplex-Kanälen in einem automatischen Kanalauswahlsystem und automatisches Kanalauswahlsystem, in welchem dieses Verfahren verwendet wird | [1987/27] | English: | A method of sharing duplex channels in an automatic channel selection system and an automatic channel selection system in which this method is applied | [1987/27] | French: | Méthode pour le partage de canaux duplex dans un système de sélection automatique de canal et système de sélection automatique de canal utilisant cette méthode | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 23.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/15] | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58133060 ; | [Y]EP0074940 (PORTAPHONE AG [CH]); | [A]WO8302380 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]US4467141 (RESCH HEINZ [AT], et al); | [A]FR2544153 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 243 (E-207)[1388], 28th October 1983; & JP-A-58 133 060 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 08-08-1983, & JP58133060 A 00000000 |