EP0227166 - A pocket sharpener for knives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1992 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forest, Charles William CH-1083 Mézières VD / CH | [1987/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Munzinger, John Patrick 1254 Jussy l'Eglise (Genève) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Munzinger, John Patrick CH-1254 Jussy l'Eglise Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 86202175.5 | 04.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | US19850808026 | 12.12.1985 Original published format: US 808026 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227166 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227166 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B24D15/06 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
B24D15/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Taschenschärfer für Messer | [1987/27] | English: | A pocket sharpener for knives | [1987/27] | French: | Affûteur de poche pour couteaux | [1991/27] |
Former [1987/27] | Affûteur de poche pour couteau | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 09.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.12.1991 | LU | 31.12.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/48] | BE | 31.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | DE108790 [ ]; | GB1255571 [ ] (LINDSAY RAYMOND WALTER [CA]); | CH545170 [ ] (ALTEXINA AG [CH]); | CH620391 [ ] (WILTSHIRE CUTLERY CO PTY [AU]); | GB2133724 [ ] (FISKARS AB OY) |