EP0228742 - Plane microwave antenna with suspended strip lines, and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
PHILIPS COMPOSANTS 117, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | For:DE
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For:FR
PHILIPS COMPOSANTS 117, quai du Président Roosevelt F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1987/29] | For:FR
RTC-COMPELEC 130, Avenue Ledru-Rollin F-75011 Paris / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbier, Pascal Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Falgat, Francis Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 03 /
Sorel, Alain Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Caron, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Caron, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86202282.9 | 16.12.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | FR19850018923 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: FR 8518923 | [1987/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228742 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228742 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/00, H01Q21/06, H01P11/00 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
H01Q21/064 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0081 (EP,US);
H01Q25/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/29] | Title | German: | Ebene Mikrowellenantenne mit Leitergruppe mit getragenem Substrat und Herstellungsverfahren | [1987/29] | English: | Plane microwave antenna with suspended strip lines, and method for its production | [1987/29] | French: | Antenne plane hyperfréquences à réseau de lignes à substrat suspendu et méthode pour en fabriquer un constituant | [1987/29] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 18.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0123350 (ELECTRONIQUE & PHYSIQUE [FR], et al); | [A]EP0089084 |