EP0187703 - Sustained release preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Yuji 18-4-243, Tamadaira 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matugi, Hideo 15-6, Tamadaira 5-chome Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Yoshiki 20-2, Tamadaira 5-chome Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1986/29] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1986/29] | Application number, filing date | 86300039.4 | 06.01.1986 | [1986/29] | Priority number, date | JP19850002160 | 11.01.1985 Original published format: JP 216085 | JP19850119692 | 04.06.1985 Original published format: JP 11969285 | JP19850135920 | 24.06.1985 Original published format: JP 13592085 | [1986/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0187703 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0187703 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187703 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22 | [1986/29] | CPC: |
A61K9/205 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/29] | Title | German: | Präparate mit verzögerter Freisetzung | [1986/29] | English: | Sustained release preparation | [1986/29] | French: | Préparations à libération prolongée | [1986/29] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 12.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0020183 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0107941 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 26, 30th June 1980, page 322, abstract no. 220645d, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. FUKUDA: "Polyelectrolyte complexes of chitosan with sodium carboxymethylcellulose", & BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN. 1980, 53(4), 837-40 | [A] - J.P. ZIKAKIS: "CHITIN, CHITOSAN, AND RELATED ENZYMES", 1984, pages 21-39, Academic Press, Inc., US; T. NAGAI et al.: "Application of chitin and chitosan to pharmaceutical preparations" |