EP0188323 - Imageable toner powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geisler, Thomas C. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300078.2 | 07.01.1986 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | US19850689706 | 08.01.1985 Original published format: US 689706 | [1986/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0188323 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0188323 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188323 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
B41M5/398 (EP,US);
B41M5/26 (KR);
Y10S430/104 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US);
Y10S430/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/30] | Title | German: | Pulvertoner, der als Bildträger dienen kann | [1990/44] | English: | Imageable toner powder | [1986/30] | French: | Toner en poudre pouvant servir de support d'une autre image | [1986/30] |
Former [1986/30] | Pulvertoner der als Bildträger dienen kann | Examination procedure | 26.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/30] | 21.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7105400 ; | [A]JP6921576 ; | [X]US4461822 (ABELE WERNER [DE]); | [A]US3674538 (SUZUKI TAKASHI); | [AP]EP0185482 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | [A] - PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, vol. 10, no. 1, January-February 1966, pages 23-24; T. SUZUKI et al.: "A new method of thermographic reproduction- An application of super cooling of materials" | [A] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS REPORT, section: Printing, Coating, Photographic Chemistry, vol. S, no. 6, 26th March 1971, Derwent publications; & JP-A-71 05 400 (FUJI PHOTO & FILM CO. LTD) 09-02-1971, & JP7105400 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS REPORT, section: Textiles, Dyeing, Paper, Cellulose, vol. 8, no. 37, 22nd October 1969, Derwent publications; & JP-A-69 21 576 (FUJI PHOTO & FILM CO. LTD) 16-09-1969, & JP6921576 A 00000000 |