EP0188334 - Methods and apparatus for transferring data for digitally controlling video equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mogi, Takao c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Suematsu, Masayuki c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1986/30] | Application number, filing date | 86300130.1 | 09.01.1986 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | JP19850006979 | 18.01.1985 Original published format: JP 697985 | [1986/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0188334 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0188334 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188334 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/20 (EP,US);
H04B14/02 (KR);
H04N5/44 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenübertragung für die Digitalsteuerung von Videoausrüstungen | [1986/30] | English: | Methods and apparatus for transferring data for digitally controlling video equipment | [1986/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le transfert de données pour la commande numérique des équipements vidéo | [1986/30] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/07] | 20.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4338632 (FALATER SCOTT L); | [A]EP0089731 (RADIOTECHNIQUE SA [FR], et al) | [X] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 56, no. 685, January 1984, pages 41-48, London, GB; T. DANBURY et al.: "Small area networks using serial data transfer" |