Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] |
30.04.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |
04.09.1990 | First examination report | |
11.04.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] |
10.10.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 30.11.1988 [1988/48] |
19.12.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] |