Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU576067B | Global Dossier | 11.08.1988 | B2 | AU5496086 | 29.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75733485 | 22.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0210708 | Global Dossier | 17.06.1992 | B1 | EP0210708 | 30.11.1988 | A3 | EP0210708 | 04.02.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75733485 | 22.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1241986 | 13.09.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US75733485 | 22.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3685694T | 14.01.1993 | T2 | DE3685694D1 | 23.07.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75733485 | 22.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0323311B | 28.03.1991 | B2 | JPS6228180 | 06.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75733485 | 22.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4678871 | 07.07.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75733485 | 22.07.1985 |