EP0210708 - Reversing switch for rechargeable hand tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Jun G. 11, West Rand Road Villa Park Illinois 60181 / US | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303/306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303/306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300162.4 | 13.01.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | US19850757334 | 22.07.1985 Original published format: US 757334 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210708 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210708 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210708 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/06 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
H01H9/063 (EP,US);
H01H19/38 (EP,US);
H01H23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | Wendeschalter für Wiederaufladbares Handwerkzeug | [1987/06] | English: | Reversing switch for rechargeable hand tool | [1987/06] | French: | Inverseur de marche pour outil à main rechargeable | [1987/06] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 06.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3691322 (MATTHEWS BENJAMIN H); | [A]US4078589 (MILLER WALTER L); | [A]FR2521340 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) |