EP0189287 - Novel B-lactam antibiotics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE COMPANY LIMITED 3-25, Hanazono-cho Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun Hokkaido / JP | For all designated states SANKEI PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 2, Kanda-Mikura-cho Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states NIPPON PHARMACEUTICAL DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE COMPANY LIMITED 3-25, Hanazono-cho Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun Hokkaido / JP | ||
For all designated states SANKEI PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 2, Kanda-Mikura-cho Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Shigeo Nippon Pharmaceutical Development Institute Company Limited 3-25, Hanazono-Cho Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun Hokkaido / JP | 02 /
Takano, Hiroyuki.Sankei Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 3-25 Hanazono-Cho, Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun / JP | 03 /
Yagihashi, Fujio. Sankei Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 3-25 Hanazono-Cho, Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun / JP | [1990/36] |
Former [1986/31] | 01 /
Shimizu, Shigeo Nippon Pharmaceutical Development Institute Company Limited 3-25, Hanazono-Cho Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun Hokkaido / JP | ||
02 /
Takano, Hiroyuki Nippon Pharmaceutical Development Institute Company Limited 3-25, Hanazono-Cho Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun Hokkaido / JP | |||
03 /
Yagihashi, Fujio Nippon Pharmaceutical Development Institute Company Limited 3-25, Hanazono-Cho Mukawa-machi Yuufutsu-gun Hokkaido / JP | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1986/31] | Burnside, Michael Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300307.5 | 17.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | JP19850008587 | 21.01.1985 Original published format: JP 858785 | JP19850011986 | 25.01.1985 Original published format: JP 1198685 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189287 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189287 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189287 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/24, C07D499/70 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
C07D277/20 (EP,US);
C07D501/36 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D277/587 (EP,US);
C07D499/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Beta-Lactam-Antibiotika | [1986/31] | English: | Novel B-lactam antibiotics | [1986/31] | French: | Bêta-lactames antibiotiques | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 28.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1476312 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [A]US4091212 (BREUER HERMANN, et al) |