EP0189328 - Top-gripping carrier with interlocked panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heynen, Johan Klain Molenbeek 15 Bergen op Zoom / NL | 02 /
Bakx, Martinus Hogestede 85 NL-4701 JH Roosendaal / NL | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300480.0 | 24.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | GB19850002015 | 25.01.1985 Original published format: GB 8502015 | GB19850018725 | 24.07.1985 Original published format: GB 8518725 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189328 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189328 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189328 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
B65D71/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/31] | Title | German: | Den Oberteil von Gegenständen untergreifender Träger mit miteinander verriegelten Klappen | [1986/31] | English: | Top-gripping carrier with interlocked panels | [1986/31] | French: | Porte-objets engageant la partie supérieure des objets et présentant des panneaux interverrouillés | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 29.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 25.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3493261 (FUNKHOUSER JAMES B, et al); | [A]US3387879 (WOOD PRENTICE J); | [A]US3016259 (DEAN LAWRENCE FRANK) |