Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
05.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
08.03.1988 | First examination report | |
27.02.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.04.1987 [1987/16] |
26.07.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.09.1986 [1986/37] |