EP0194046 - Dihydropyridine alkanol amines, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1986/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hargreaves, Rodney Brian 42 Deva Close Poynton Cheshire / GB | 02 /
McLoughlin, Bernard Joseph 7 Pexhill Drive Macclesfield Cheshire / GB | 03 /
Mills, Stuart Dennett 17 Harrington Drive Gawsworth Macclesfield, Sk11 9RD / GB | 04 /
Taylor, Melvin Joseph 7 Kenmore Road Sale Cheshire / GB | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | Slatcher, Reginald Peter, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [1986/37] | Application number, filing date | 86300885.0 | 10.02.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | GB19850003426 | 11.02.1985 Original published format: GB 8503426 | [1986/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0194046 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/90, C07D401/12, A61K31/44 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D211/90 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | Dihydropyridin-Alkanolamine, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1986/37] | English: | Dihydropyridine alkanol amines, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1986/37] | French: | Dihydropyridine alkanolamines, leur procédé de préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1986/37] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 10.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/04] | 18.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP60136558 ; | [A]GB1409865 (SCIENCE UNION & CIE); | [AP]EP0151006 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 24, no. 5, May 1981, pages 628-631, American Chemical Society, Washington, US; J.J. BALDWIN et al.: "Approaches to vasodilating/bêta-adrenergic blocking agents: examples of the dihydrolutidine type" | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 13, 31st March 1986, page 711, no. 109478d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 60 136 558 (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG. CO.) 20-07-1985, & JP60136558 A 00000000 |