EP0192402 - Automated guided vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON-KENWAY, INC. 515 East 100 South Salt Lake City Utah 84102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | For all designated states EATON-KENWAY, INC. 515 East 100 South Salt Lake City Utah 84102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pipes, George Richard 3635 Choke Cherry Drive Salt Lake City Utah 84109 / US | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300935.3 | 12.02.1986 | [1986/35] | Priority number, date | US19850702516 | 19.02.1985 Original published format: US 702516 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0192402 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0192402 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/24 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
B62D1/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/35] | Title | German: | Automatisch gelenktes Fahrzeug | [1986/35] | English: | Automated guided vehicle | [1986/35] | French: | Véhicule à guidage automatique | [1986/35] | File destroyed: | 01.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0102706 ; | [A]DE2713519 |