Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE66071T | 15.08.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86301008 | 13.02.1986 | US70514985 | 25.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0193315 | Global Dossier | 07.08.1991 | B1 | EP0193315 | 19.08.1987 | A3 | EP0193315 | 03.09.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70514985 | 25.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1238685 | 28.06.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US70514985 | 25.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3680687D1 | 12.09.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US70514985 | 25.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH087191B | 29.01.1996 | B2 | JPS61195352 | 29.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US70514985 | 25.02.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4644271 | 17.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US70514985 | 25.02.1985 |