EP0193315 - Method and apparatus for examining a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTV Steel Company, Inc. P.O. Box 6778 LTV Steel Building Cleveland Ohio 44101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states LTV Steel Company, Inc. P.O. Box 6778 LTV Steel Building Cleveland Ohio 44101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toth, James M. 4826 Ridgebury Boulevard Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | 02 /
Harris, Richard M. 9360 Sharon Lane Drive North Royalton Ohio 44133 / US | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Adams, William Gordon, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | ||
Former [1986/36] | Fisher, Bernard Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301008.8 | 13.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | US19850705149 | 25.02.1985 Original published format: US 705149 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193315 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193315 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193315 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/90 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
G01N27/9046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung eines Werkstücks | [1986/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for examining a workpiece | [1986/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour examiner une pièce | [1986/36] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 16.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.08.1991 | BE | 07.08.1991 | CH | 07.08.1991 | IT | 07.08.1991 | LI | 07.08.1991 | SE | 07.08.1991 | LU | 29.02.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
BE | 07.08.1991 | ||
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
IT | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/32] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
BE | 07.08.1991 | ||
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/09] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1138962 ; | [A]US3152302 (ALLEN JOHN W, et al); | [A]US3419797 (LIBBY HUGO L); | [A]US3872379 (BROOKS ROBERT A, et al); | [A]GB2014317 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]DE3228382 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]); | [APD]WO8600412 (LTV STEEL CO INC [US]) |