EP0192438 - Process for producing high purity solutions of alkali metal hydrosulfites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLIN CORPORATION 350 Knotter Drive P.O. Box 586 Cheshire, CT 06410-0586 / US | [1986/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cawlfield, David William Route 2, Box 526 Cleveland, TN 37311 / US | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1986/35] | Application number, filing date | 86301039.3 | 14.02.1986 | [1986/35] | Priority number, date | US19850703780 | 21.02.1985 Original published format: US 703780 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0192438 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0192438 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0192438 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/66 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
C01B17/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkalimetallhydrosulfitlösungen hoher Reinheit | [1986/35] | English: | Process for producing high purity solutions of alkali metal hydrosulfites | [1986/35] | French: | Procédé de préparation de solutions d'hydrosulfites de métaux alcalins de haute pureté | [1986/35] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 14.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2311752 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]FR1396902 (ZOUTINDUSTRIE) |