blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0197635

EP0197635 - Acrylic emulsion copolymers for thickening aqueous systems and copolymerizable surfactant monomers for use therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.1992
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation
501 Silverside Road
Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US
[1991/04]
Former [1986/42]For all designated states
Alco Chemical Corporation
909 Mueller Drive
Chattanooga Tennessee 37406 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ruffner, Charles G.
1624 Berkley Circle Chattanooga
Tennessee 37405 / US
02 / Wilkerson III, John M.
6436 Lake Meadows Drive Hixon
Tennessee 37343 / US
[1986/42]
Representative(s)Hale, Stephen Geoffrey, et al
Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street
London WC2N 6EF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/42]Hale, Stephen Geoffrey, et al
J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn
London WC1V 6DE / GB
Application number, filing date86301099.718.02.1986
[1986/42]
Priority number, dateUS1985078257101.10.1985         Original published format: US 782571
US1985071976804.04.1985         Original published format: US 719768
[1986/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0197635
Date:15.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0197635
Date:19.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0197635
Date:13.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:C08F246/00, C08F220/04, C08F222/00, C08F220/36, C09D7/00, C11D3/37, D21H19/20, C09K7/02
[1991/46]
CPC:
D21H19/58 (EP,US); C08F220/04 (EP,US); C08F246/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/8108 (EP,US); C09D7/43 (EP,US); C09K3/00 (EP,US);
C09K8/24 (EP,US); C11D3/3765 (EP,US); D06P1/525 (EP,US);
C08L33/02 (EP,US); C08L33/08 (EP,US); C08L39/00 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1986/42]C08F246/00, C08F220/04, C08F222/00, C08F220/36, C09D7/00, C11D3/37, D21H1/28, C09K7/02, C09J3/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/42]
TitleGerman:Acrylatemulsionspolymere als Verdickungsmittel in wässrigen Systemen und copolymerisierbare monomere Emulgiermittel verwendbar in diesen Copolymeren[1986/42]
English:Acrylic emulsion copolymers for thickening aqueous systems and copolymerizable surfactant monomers for use therein[1986/42]
French:Copolymères acryliques en émulsion comme agent épaississant dans des systèmes aqueux et monomères émulsifiants copolymérisables utilisables dans ces copolymères[1986/42]
MiscellaneousEPB 1991/39: (deleted)
EPB 1986/42: A request pursuant to Rule 88 EPC for correction of the claims has been filed on 27.05.86. A decision on the request will be taken by the competent Examining Division.
Examination procedure16.01.1988Examination requested  [1988/12]
25.04.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.03.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.1991Fee for grant paid
05.06.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.11.1991
CH13.11.1991
LI13.11.1991
SE13.11.1991
LU29.02.1992
[1999/52]
Former [1992/29]AT13.11.1991
CH13.11.1991
LI13.11.1991
SE13.11.1991
Former [1992/26]CH13.11.1991
LI13.11.1991
SE13.11.1991
Former [1992/24]SE13.11.1991
Documents cited:Search[A]US4384096  (SONNABEND LAWRENCE F)
ExaminationEP1073109
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.