EP0194777 - Cigarette carton and blank therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products Inc. 3601 Commerce Road Richmond Virginia 23234 / US | ||
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states Philip Morris Incorporated P.O. Box 26583 Richmond Virginia 23261 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turnage, William E. 13201 Farm Brook Court Midlothian Virginia 23113 / US | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301273.8 | 21.02.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | US19850705366 | 25.02.1985 Original published format: US 705366 | [1986/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194777 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194777 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194777 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10, B65D5/66 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
B65D85/1036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1986/38] | Title | German: | Zigarettenkarton und Zuschnitt dafür | [1986/38] | English: | Cigarette carton and blank therefor | [1986/38] | French: | Carton à cigarettes et son flan | [1986/38] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 03.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1194314 (APPLIC TECH D EMBALLAGES MODER); | [A]FR2350823 (BRAUNSTEIN PAPETERIES [FR]); | [XP]EP0134549 (FOCKE & CO [DE]); | [A]CH184448 (LITHOGRAPHIE & CARTONNAGE A G [CH]) |