EP0193391 - Overhead blind [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURON CORPORATION 6-12, Kanemecho 2-chome Nagaoka-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states KURON CORPORATION 6-12, Kanemecho 2-chome Nagaoka-shi Niigata-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchida, Eiharu 596, Ohazahitozura Tochio-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301368.6 | 26.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | JP19850035319 | 26.02.1985 Original published format: JP 3531985 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193391 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193391 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/26, A01G9/22, E04F10/10 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
E06B9/26 (EP);
A01G9/222 (EP);
E04F10/10 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/36] | Title | German: | Horizontal-Sonnenschutzvorrichtung | [1986/36] | English: | Overhead blind | [1986/36] | French: | Store horizontal | [1986/36] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 30.01.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/38] | 25.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.01.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1251507 ; | [X]FR2509363 (GENDRE ETS [FR]); | [X]GB699431 (VENETIAN VOGUE LTD); | [XP]DE3420452 (HUEPPE GMBH [DE]); | [A]CH365863 (HAFNER FRIEDRICH D [CH]); | [A]EP0096518 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) |