EP0195580 - Tertiary perfluorinated compounds as rate enhancing additives in PTFE dispersion polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.09.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beresniewicz, Aleksander 2501 Elmdale Lane Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301724.0 | 11.03.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | US19850711054 | 12.03.1985 Original published format: US 711054 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195580 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/26 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
C08F14/26 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/26, C08F2/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/39] | Title | German: | Tertiäre perfluorierte Verbindungen als reaktionsgeschwindigkeitserhöhende Zusätze bei der Dispersionspolymerisation von PTFE | [1986/39] | English: | Tertiary perfluorinated compounds as rate enhancing additives in PTFE dispersion polymerization | [1986/39] | French: | Composés perfluorés tertiaires comme additifs pour élever la vitesse de réaction de la polymérisation en dispersion de PTFE | [1986/39] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 04.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 22.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/45] | 18.06.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US4555556 (BERESNIEWICZ ALEKSANDER [US]); | [AD]US2559752 (BERRY KENNETH L) |