EP0194887 - Solid cosmetic preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Toshiyuki 5-8 Motokitakata 1-chome Ichikawa-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Nohta, Masahide 3-28 Nakashizu Sakura-shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
Shigeta, Akira 3-285 Shishibone Edogawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ina, Yoshimitsu 20-1 Innai 3-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba / JP | 05 /
Nozawa, Manami 29-10 Isobe 3-chome Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301827.1 | 13.03.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | JP19850050124 | 13.03.1985 Original published format: JP 5012485 | JP19850196973 | 06.09.1985 Original published format: JP 19697385 | JP19850196974 | 06.09.1985 Original published format: JP 19697485 | [1986/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194887 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194887 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194887 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/021 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
C11C3/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,US);
A61Q1/12 (EP,US);
C11C3/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/872 (EP,US);
Y10S424/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/38] | Title | German: | Festes kosmetisches Präparat | [1986/38] | English: | Solid cosmetic preparation | [1986/38] | French: | Préparation cosmétique solide | [1986/38] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2942021 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [A]EP0028457 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]US4383875 (RUSS JULIO G, et al); | [A]DE3310094 (GREITER FRANZ PROF DR ING) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, C Field, Vol. 6, No. 227, November 12, 1982 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 76 C 134 * Kokai-No. 57-130 909 (Nisshin) * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, C Field, Vol. 6, No. 214, October 27, 1982 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 127 C 131 * Kokai-No. 57-120 508 (Kao Sekken) * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, C Field, Vol. 8, No. 114, May 26, 1984 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 58 C 225 * Kokai-No. 59-27 808 (Shiseido) * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, C Field, Vol. 5, No. 132, August 22, 1981 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 44 C 68 * Kokai-No. 56-65 900 (Kao Sekken) * | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 6 ,no .227 ,November 12,1982 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; unexamined applications, C field, vol. 8, no. 114, May 26, 1984 |