EP0198600 - Composite, pre-stressed, structural member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/43] | Composite, pre-stressed, structural member and method of making same | ||
[1990/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keith, Guy Nelson & Grossmann, Stanley Joseph trading as KEITH & GROSSMAN LEASING COMPANY 121 Collier Drive Norman Oklahoma 73069 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states Keith, Guy Nelson & Grossmann, Stanley Joseph trading as KEITH & GROSSMAN LEASING COMPANY 121 Collier Drive Norman Oklahoma 73069 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grossman, Stanley Joseph 1024 Cruce Norman Oklahoma 73069 / US | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1986/43] | Application number, filing date | 86301876.8 | 14.03.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | US19850719339 | 03.04.1985 Original published format: US 719339 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198600 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198600 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B28B23/18, E04C3/294 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
E04C3/294 (EP,US);
B28B19/00 (EP,US);
B28B23/06 (EP,US);
E04B5/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Verbundbauteil mit Vorspannung | [1990/09] | English: | Composite, pre-stressed, structural member | [1990/09] | French: | Elément de construction mixte soumis à la précontrainte | [1990/09] |
Former [1986/43] | Verbundbauteil mit Vorspannung sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1986/43] | Composite, pre-stressed, structural member and method of making same | ||
Former [1986/43] | Elément de construction mixte soumis à la précontrainte et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 13.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.1990 | BE | 28.02.1990 | IT | 28.02.1990 | LU | 31.03.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 28.02.1990 | |
BE | 28.02.1990 | ||
IT | 28.02.1990 | ||
LU | 31.03.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.02.1990 | |
BE | 28.02.1990 | ||
IT | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | AT | 28.02.1990 | |
BE | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 28.02.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | AT50958B [ ] (WITKOWITZER BERGB GEWERKSCHAFT); | US4493177 [ ] (GROSSMAN STANLEY J [US]) |