EP0195632 - Spraying equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nomix Manufacturing Co. Limited Fillwood Factory Charlton Road Kingswood Bristol BS15 1HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states Nomix Manufacturing Co. Limited Fillwood Factory Charlton Road Kingswood Bristol BS15 1HB / GB | ||
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states Gill, David Charles Wellfield House Parkhouse Lane Keynsham Bristol BS18 2SG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, David Charles 5 The Keep,Millers Lodge Warmley, Bristol BS155YQ / GB | [1987/19] |
Former [1986/39] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301930.3 | 17.03.1986 | [1986/39] | Priority number, date | EP19850301865 | 18.03.1985 Original published format: EP 85301865 | GB19850023647 | 25.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8523647 | [1986/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195632 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195632 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B05B3/10, A01M7/00 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
B05B1/3026 (EP,US);
A01M7/0028 (EP,US);
B05B3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | Sprühgerät | [1986/39] | English: | Spraying equipment | [1986/39] | French: | Appareil de pulvérisation | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 13.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1120230 [ ] (KARL MARX STADT MASCHF); | US3341168 [ ] (TOEPPEN THURSTON H); | US4294408 [ ] (SNYDER IRVING F, et al); | GB2136320 [ ] (GILL D C); | GB2155816 [ ] (GILL D C) |