EP0208390 - Spray cap and bottle engagement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1988 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | ||
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center Saint Paul Minnesota 55102 / US | ||
Former [1987/03] | For all designated states Economics Laboratory, Inc. Osborn Building Saint Paul, MN 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sledge, Larry Charles 2001 Winterfield Road Midlothian VA 23113 / US | 02 /
Dwyer, Patrick J. 4872 Churchill Street Shoreview MN 55112 / US | 03 /
Dennis, Stephen R. 6746 Foliage Court Rosemount MN 55068 / US | [1987/03] | Representative(s) | Bond, Bentley George Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | Bond, Bentley George Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301997.2 | 19.03.1986 | [1987/03] | Priority number, date | US19850725205 | 19.04.1985 Original published format: US 725205 | US19850760690 | 30.07.1985 Original published format: US 760690 | [1987/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208390 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/34, B65D41/16, B67B3/22 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
B05B11/001 (EP);
B05B11/1045 (EP);
B05B11/1057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/03] | Title | German: | Verbindung zwischen Sprühkappe und Flasche | [1987/03] | English: | Spray cap and bottle engagement | [1987/03] | French: | Joint entre un récipient et son capuchon pour vaporiser | [1987/03] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 14.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/11] | 15.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3191814 [ ] (CORSETTE DOUGLAS F, et al); | GB2014233 [ ] (ADM SPA); | EP0034998 [ ] (OBRIST AG ALBERT [CH]); | GB2122692 [ ] (SAR SPA); | US4454965 [ ] (KIRK JR DONALD C [US]) |