EP0200345 - Anti-allergic or anti-inflammatory substituted (hetero)-aralkylamino-ortho-phenols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buckle, Derek Richard 18 Hillfield Road Redhill Surrey, RH1 4AP / GB | 02 /
Webster, Richard Andrew Bentley 86 Surrey Grove Sutton Surrey, SM1 3PN / GB | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302138.2 | 24.03.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | GB19850008375 | 30.03.1985 Original published format: GB 8508375 | GB19850022241 | 07.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8522241 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200345 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200345 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/58, C07C91/44, C07C121/84, C07C121/78, C07D307/52, C07D333/20, C07C97/10, A61K31/135, A61K31/275, A61K31/42, A61K31/34 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP);
C07D307/52 (EP);
C07D333/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/45] | Title | German: | Antiallergische oder antiinflammatorische substituierte (Hetero)-aralkyl-amino-ortho-phenole | [1986/45] | English: | Anti-allergic or anti-inflammatory substituted (hetero)-aralkylamino-ortho-phenols | [1986/45] | French: | (Hétéro)-aralkylamino-ortho-phénols substitués antiallergiques ou anti-inflammatoires | [1986/45] | File destroyed: | 20.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 28.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/30] | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0083204 |