EP0198617 - Non-linear electromagnetic vibration fluid compression device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai New Mechanical Technology Development Centre Shanghai University of Technology 149 Yian Chang Road P.O. Box 195 Shanghai / CN | [1986/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cao, Pei Sheng 33/5 Jiao Tong Road Shanghai / CN | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302250.5 | 26.03.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | CN1985103417 | 20.04.1985 Original published format: CN 85103417 | CN1985102855 | 01.04.1985 Original published format: CN 85102855 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198617 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198617 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198617 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/02, F04B35/04, F04B17/04 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
F04B17/042 (EP);
H02K33/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Nicht-lineare elektromagnetische Vibrationsvorrichtung zur Verdichtung eines Fluidums | [1986/43] | English: | Non-linear electromagnetic vibration fluid compression device | [1986/43] | French: | Dispositif de vibration électromagnétique non-linéaire pour la compression d'un fluide | [1986/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/08] | 05.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1988 | 31.03.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.05.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.1989 | BE | 23.11.1989 | CH | 23.11.1989 | FR | 23.11.1989 | IT | 23.11.1989 | LI | 23.11.1989 | NL | 23.11.1989 | SE | 23.11.1989 | GB | 26.03.1990 | LU | 31.03.1990 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 23.11.1989 | |
BE | 23.11.1989 | ||
CH | 23.11.1989 | ||
IT | 23.11.1989 | ||
LI | 23.11.1989 | ||
NL | 23.11.1989 | ||
SE | 23.11.1989 | ||
GB | 26.03.1990 | ||
LU | 31.03.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.11.1989 | |
BE | 23.11.1989 | ||
CH | 23.11.1989 | ||
IT | 23.11.1989 | ||
LI | 23.11.1989 | ||
NL | 23.11.1989 | ||
SE | 23.11.1989 | ||
GB | 26.03.1990 | ||
Former [1991/30] | AT | 23.11.1989 | |
BE | 23.11.1989 | ||
CH | 23.11.1989 | ||
LI | 23.11.1989 | ||
NL | 23.11.1989 | ||
SE | 23.11.1989 | ||
GB | 26.03.1990 | ||
Former [1991/14] | AT | 23.11.1989 | |
BE | 23.11.1989 | ||
CH | 23.11.1989 | ||
LI | 23.11.1989 | ||
NL | 23.11.1989 | ||
SE | 23.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 23.11.1989 | |
CH | 23.11.1989 | ||
LI | 23.11.1989 | ||
NL | 23.11.1989 | ||
SE | 23.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/29] | CH | 23.11.1989 | |
LI | 23.11.1989 | ||
NL | 23.11.1989 | ||
SE | 23.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/28] | CH | 23.11.1989 | |
LI | 23.11.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2950831 ; | [Y]US2721453 ; | [A]GB1551522 ; | [A]DE821000 ; | [A]GB2018523 ; | [A]GB2017422 ; | [A]DE902641 ; | [A]DE2310955 |