EP0197719 - Light-emitting diode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.1991 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burnham, Robert D. 2912 South Court Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 02 /
Paoli, Thomas L. 420 Cypress Drive Los Altos California 94022 / US | 03 /
Thornton, Robert L. 123 Mission Drive East Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 04 /
Sprague, Robert A. 13755 Calle Tacuba Saratoga California 95070 / US | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1986/42] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302296.8 | 27.03.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | US19850719595 | 03.04.1985 Original published format: US 719595 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0197719 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0197719 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
H01L33/44 (EP,US);
B41J2/44 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
G06K15/1252 (EP,US);
H01L33/0004 (EP,US);
H01L33/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/42] | Title | German: | Leuchtdiode | [1986/42] | English: | Light-emitting diode | [1986/42] | French: | Diode électroluminescente | [1986/42] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 13.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8500076 (RCA CORP [US]) | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. QE19, no. 1, January 1983, pages 78-82, New York, US; I. KAMINOW et al.: "Lateral confinement in GaAsP superluminescent diode at 1.3 um" | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 18, no. 11, 1st June 1979, pages 1812-1815, New York, US; T. KAJIMURA et al.: "Transverse mode stabilized Ga1-xAlxA visible diode lasers" | [A] - JOURNAL OF OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 1, no. 2, November 1980, pages 42-50, Berlin; D. BOTEZ "Single mode AlGuAs diode lasers" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 33, no. 12, 15th December 1978, pages 1015-1017, New York, US; D. SCIFRES et al.: "Phase-locked semiconductor laser array" | [XP] - IBID, vol. 47, no. 5, 1st September 1985, pages 450-452, New York, US; T. PAOLI et al.: "High power multiple emitter AlGaAs superluminescent diodes" |