blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0212771

EP0212771 - Viscosity stable plastisol sealant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.1988
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PROTECTIVE TREATMENTS INC.
3345 Stop Eight Road
Dayton, OH 45414 / US
[1987/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Schiappacasse, Russell F.
4322 Riverside No. 1-2
Dayton Ohio 45405 / US
02 / Gerace, Michael J.
5405 Chimney Circle
Kettering Ohio 45440 / US
03 / Morgan, Douglas
12136 Pippin Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45231 / US
[1987/10]
Representative(s)McCallum, William Potter, et al
Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow
G1 3AE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/10]McCallum, William Potter, et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date86302500.304.04.1986
[1987/10]
Priority number, dateUS1985076788621.08.1985         Original published format: US 767886
[1987/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0212771
Date:04.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.1986
ClassificationIPC:C09K3/10
[1987/10]
CPC:
C09K3/10 (EP); C08K5/5406 (EP); C09K2200/0239 (EP);
C09K2200/0635 (EP); C09K2200/0655 (EP)
C-Set:
C08K5/5406, C08L27/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/10]
TitleGerman:Viskositätsstabile Plastisoldichtungsmasse[1987/10]
English:Viscosity stable plastisol sealant[1987/10]
French:Plastisol à viscosité stable utilisable comme matériau d'étanchéité[1987/10]
File destroyed:23.08.1994
Examination procedure05.09.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/17]
02.12.1987Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/17]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2148457  [ ];
 AT271680B  [ ]
    [ ] - DR. OTTO-ALBRECHT NEUMULLER "Rompps Chemie Lexikon", 7th edition, 1977 FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSBUCHHANDLUNGStuttgart * Pages 3893-3896 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.