EP0199485 - Intermediates and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorgan, Roderick John Lingworth, Scotts Hill Outwood Surrey, RH1 5PR / GB | 02 /
Elliot, Richard Leonard 18 Little Bookham Street Great Bookham Leatherhead Surrey, KT23 3AQ / GB | 03 /
Webster, Richard Andrew Bentley 86 Surrey Grove Sutton Surrey, SM1 3PN / GB | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Lockwood, Barbara Ann, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [1986/44] | Application number, filing date | 86302548.2 | 07.04.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | GB19850009435 | 12.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8509435 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199485 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199485 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199485 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/08, C07D405/06, C07D409/06, C07D487/04, C07D498/04 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP);
C07D241/08 (EP);
C07D409/06 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/44] | Title | German: | Zwischenprodukte und Verfahren | [1986/44] | English: | Intermediates and process | [1986/44] | French: | Intermédiaires et leur procédé | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/48] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43] | Request for further processing for: | 05.09.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0134984 ; | [Y]EP0086678 |