EP0201205 - Apparatus and methods for semiconductor wafer testing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMETRIX CORPORATION 3255 Scott Boulevard Building 2 Suite A Santa Clara California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states PROMETRIX CORPORATION 3255 Scott Boulevard Building 2 Suite A Santa Clara California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mallory, Chester 1073 Lucot Way Campbell California 95008 / US | 02 /
Perloff, David Steven 1089 Valley Forge Drive Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | 03 /
Hung, Van Pham 1753 Daltrey Way San Jose California 95132 / US | 04 /
Droblisch, Sandor 15362 Elm Park Monte Sereno California 95030 / US | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302565.6 | 07.04.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | US19850726498 | 24.04.1985 Original published format: US 726498 | [1986/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0201205 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201205 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0201205 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, H05K13/02, H05K13/00 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
G01R31/2831 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/46] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Prüfung von Halbleiterchips | [1986/46] | English: | Apparatus and methods for semiconductor wafer testing | [1986/46] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour tester des plaquettes semi-conductrices | [1986/46] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 02.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.1990 | BE | 07.11.1990 | CH | 07.11.1990 | FR | 07.11.1990 | IT | 07.11.1990 | LI | 07.11.1990 | NL | 07.11.1990 | SE | 07.11.1990 | LU | 30.04.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 07.11.1990 | |
BE | 07.11.1990 | ||
CH | 07.11.1990 | ||
IT | 07.11.1990 | ||
LI | 07.11.1990 | ||
NL | 07.11.1990 | ||
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
FR | 29.03.1991 | ||
LU | 30.04.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.11.1990 | |
BE | 07.11.1990 | ||
CH | 07.11.1990 | ||
IT | 07.11.1990 | ||
LI | 07.11.1990 | ||
NL | 07.11.1990 | ||
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
FR | 29.03.1991 | ||
Former [1991/50] | AT | 07.11.1990 | |
BE | 07.11.1990 | ||
CH | 07.11.1990 | ||
LI | 07.11.1990 | ||
NL | 07.11.1990 | ||
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
FR | 29.03.1991 | ||
Former [1991/45] | AT | 07.11.1990 | |
BE | 07.11.1990 | ||
CH | 07.11.1990 | ||
LI | 07.11.1990 | ||
NL | 07.11.1990 | ||
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/42] | AT | 07.11.1990 | |
BE | 07.11.1990 | ||
CH | 07.11.1990 | ||
LI | 07.11.1990 | ||
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/38] | BE | 07.11.1990 | |
SE | 07.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 07.11.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4328553 (FREDRIKSEN THORBJOERN R, et al) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 17, no. 3, August 1974, page 880-881, New York, US; R.E. HOGAN et al.: "Precision mechanism for use in a system requiring precise alignment" | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 10, March 1979, pages 4086-4087, IBM Corp., New York, US; W. SCHWARZ: "Rotatable wafer chuck for testing" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 17, no. 8, January 1975, pages 2220-2221, New York, US; M. GAGNE: "No-edge contact wafer orientor" | Examination | US4204155 | US4703252 |