EP0200395 - End component and side wall for a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MB GROUP PLC Caversham Bridge House Waterman Place Reading Berkshire RG1 8DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states MB GROUP plc Caversham Bridge House Waterman Place Reading Berkshire RG1 8DN / GB | ||
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states METAL BOX p.l.c. Queens House Forbury Road Reading RG1 3JH Berkshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collins, Malcolm George 23 Charlton Village Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 7HE / GB | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Sawers, Lawrence Peter, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1986/45] | Application number, filing date | 86302627.4 | 09.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | GB19850010817 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8510817 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200395 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200395 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200395 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D39/04, B65D8/18 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
B29C65/0672 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/12821 (EP,US);
B29C66/1284 (EP,US);
B29C66/322 (EP,US);
B29C66/5344 (EP,US);
B29C66/542 (EP,US);
B29C66/612 (EP,US);
B65D43/021 (EP,US);
B29C65/8253 (EP,US);
B29C66/232 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/929 (EP,US);
B29C66/93451 (EP,US);
B29C66/939 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00314 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00435 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00509 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00546 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00657 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00685 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0633 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/065 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/45] | Title | German: | Endelement und Wandung für Behälter | [1986/45] | English: | End component and side wall for a container | [1986/45] | French: | Elément d'extrémité et paroi pour récipient | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 27.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0144197 (METAL BOX PLC [GB]) |