EP0198693 - Fast deploying tape transport [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, Dennis M. 257 Clifford Avenue Redwood City California 94062 / US | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302723.1 | 11.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | US19850722924 | 12.04.1985 Original published format: US 722924 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198693 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198693 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198693 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/665 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
G11B15/6653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/43] | Title | German: | Bandtransport mit schneller Ausziehung | [1986/43] | English: | Fast deploying tape transport | [1986/43] | French: | Transport de bande à déploiement rapide | [1986/43] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/12: Teilanmeldung 91200198.9 eingereicht am 11/04/86 | EPB 1992/12: Divisional application 91200198.9 filed on 11/04/86 | EPB 1992/12: Demande divisionnaire 91200198.9 déposée le 11/04/86 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91200198.9 / EP0429437 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Request for further processing for: | 11.02.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.03.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58218066 ; | [XP]JP59218657 ; | [X]JP5558843 ; | [X]JP59129966 ; | [X]JP59112460 ; | [X]FR2458127 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0115075 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 72 (P-265)[1509], 4th April 1984; & JP-A-58 218 066 (SONY K.K.) 19-12-1983, & JP58218066 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 90 (P-350)[1813], 19th April 1985; & JP-A-59 218 657 (CANON K.K.) 08-12-1984, & JP59218657 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol, 4, no. 100 (P-19)[582], page 84 C 19, 18th July 1980; & JP-A-55 58 843 (MATSUSHITA DENKI K.K.) 01-05-1980, & JP5558843 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 259 (P-317)[1696], 28th November 1984; & JP-A-59 129 966 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 26-07-1984, & JP59129966 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 237 (P-310)[1674], 30th October 1984; & JP-A-59 112 460 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 28-06-1984, & JP59112460 A 00000000 |