EP0199515 - Coupled cavity travelling wave tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EEV LIMITED 106 Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex, CM1 2QU / GB | [1989/47] |
Former [1986/44] | For all designated states English Electric Valve Company Limited 106, Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex, CM1 2QU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Robin Charles Moorhouse Proctors Farm Beauchamp Roding Ongar Essex / GB | 02 /
Carter, Richard Geoffrey Hawthorn House 4, Lindeth Road Silverdale Carnforth Lancashire / GB | 03 /
Griggs, Alan 2, Sycamore Road Heybridge Maldon Essex / GB | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Cockayne, Gillian Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | Cockayne, Gillian GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1986/44] | Rouse, David George The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302740.5 | 14.04.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | GB19850010443 | 24.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8510443 | GB19860002293 | 30.01.1986 Original published format: GB 8602293 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199515 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199515 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199515 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J23/24, H01J23/12, H01J25/00 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
H01J23/0873 (EP,US);
H01J23/005 (EP,US);
H01J23/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/44] | H01J23/12, H01J25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/44] | Title | German: | Gekoppelte Hohlraum-Laufzeitröhren | [1986/44] | English: | Coupled cavity travelling wave tubes | [1986/44] | French: | Tubes à ondes progressives couplés par cavité | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/30] | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.1990 | BE | 12.12.1990 | SE | 12.12.1990 | CH | 30.04.1991 | LI | 30.04.1991 | LU | 30.04.1991 | [2002/23] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 12.12.1990 | |
BE | 12.12.1990 | ||
CH | 30.04.1991 | ||
LI | 30.04.1991 | ||
LU | 30.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/09] | AT | 12.12.1990 | |
BE | 12.12.1990 | ||
CH | 30.04.1991 | ||
LI | 30.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/49] | AT | 12.12.1990 | |
BE | 12.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/39] | BE | 12.12.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | US4057748 [ ] (DAVIS PETER ROBERT); | FR2427680 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | GB1379184 [ ] (SPERRY RAND CORP); | GB2119165 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | GB1080169 [ ] (ASS ELECT IND) |