EP0199552 - Method of simulating by computer the appearance properties of a warp knit fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kliman, Harvey Louis RD 2 Box 48H Chadds Ford Pennsylvania 19317 / US | 02 /
Pike, Royden Harold 179 Honeywell Drive Claymont Delaware 19703 / US | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302889.0 | 17.04.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | US19850724599 | 18.04.1985 Original published format: US 724599 | [1986/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199552 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199552 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199552 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D04B37/00 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
D04B21/04 (KR);
D04B37/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Simulieren des Erscheinungsbildes von Kettenstrickwaren durch Computer | [1986/44] | English: | Method of simulating by computer the appearance properties of a warp knit fabric | [1986/44] | French: | Procédé pour la simulation par ordinateur de l'apparence d'une étoffe tricot-chaîne | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1421911 (WILDT MELLOR BROMLEY LTD) | [A] - MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, vol. 2, February 1984, pages 139-144 Heidelberg; W. REHR "Computer an Textilmaschinen und in Textilbetrieben - gezeigt auf der ITMA 83" |