EP0201236 - Electric circuit board assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ratcliff, Colin Keith 36 Toddy Hill Road Sandyhook Connecticut 06482 / GB | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | Turner, Alan Reginald, et al BENDIX LIMITED Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | [1987/40] |
Former [1986/46] | Turner, Alan Reginald BENDIX LIMITED Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302974.0 | 21.04.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | GB19850010839 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8510839 | [1986/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0201236 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/70 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP,US);
H01R12/7005 (EP,US);
H01R12/7023 (EP,US);
H01R12/7058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1986/46] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schaltungsplattenzusammenbau | [1986/46] | English: | Electric circuit board assembly | [1986/46] | French: | Assemblage de plaque à circuit électrique | [1986/46] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 29.06.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2061862 (AMP FRANCE SA); | [A]EP0147039 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]US3970353 (KAUFMAN JOHN WILSON) |