EP0200451 - Protease resistant urokinase composition, its production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco CA 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaber, Michael 369 Avocado Street Costa Mesa California 92627 / US | 02 /
Heyneker, Herbert Louis 501 Roehampton Road Hillsborough California 94010 / US | 03 /
Vehar, Gordon Allen 14 Maple Way San Carlos California 94070 / US | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86302981.5 | 21.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | US19850725468 | 22.04.1985 Original published format: US 725468 | US19850766858 | 16.08.1985 Original published format: US 766858 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0200451 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200451 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/72, C12N15/00, A61K37/54, C07H21/04 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
C12N9/6462 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/67 (EP,US);
C12N15/71 (EP,US);
C12N9/6459 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1986/45] | Title | German: | Proteaseresistente Urokinase-Zusammensetzung, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1986/45] | English: | Protease resistant urokinase composition, its production and use | [1986/45] | French: | Composition d'urokinase résistant aux protéinases, sa production et son utilisation | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 28.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0037687 [ ] (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | US4381346 [ ] (HUASIN SYED S [US], et al); | EP0092182 [ ] (GENENTECH INC [US]) |