EP0200475 - Method of forming a glass sheet with a ceramic paint thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boaz, Premakaran Tucker 16842 Yorkshire Livonia Michigan 48154 / US | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303085.4 | 24.04.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | US19850728645 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: US 728645 | [1986/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0200475 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200475 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200475 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/02, C03C8/14, C03B23/00 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
C03C8/14 (EP,US);
C03B23/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Glasscheibe mit einer keramischen Glasur darauf | [1986/45] | English: | Method of forming a glass sheet with a ceramic paint thereon | [1986/45] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une feuille de verre revêtue d'une peinture céramique | [1986/45] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/31] | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57191253 ; | [Y]GB2072159 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [A]FR2237847 (TRIPLEX SAFETY GLASS CO [GB]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 19, 10th November 1980, page 298, abstract no. 184410m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-57 191 253 (TOSHIBA GLASS K.K.) 25-11-1982, & JP57191253 A 00000000 |