EP0213688 - Liquid crystal display surface illuminating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REFAC Electronics Corp. West Hill Road Winsted Connecticut 06098 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states REFAC ELECTRONICS CORP. West Hill Road Winsted Connecticut 06098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McComb, Richard 97 Partridge Drive Newington Connecticut / US | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303499.7 | 08.05.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | US19850770731 | 29.08.1985 Original published format: US 770731 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213688 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G09F9/35 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
G02F1/133615 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungseinrichtung für Flächen von Flüssigkristallanzeigen | [1987/11] | English: | Liquid crystal display surface illuminating apparatus | [1987/11] | French: | Appareil d'éclairage pour surfaces d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [1987/11] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 12.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/18] | 08.12.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8303013 [ ]; | US4487481 [ ]; | DE3105063 [ ] |