|
02.11.1995 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1995 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1995 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1995 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1995 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.07.1995 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.03.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.07.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.02.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1993 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.03.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.07.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1992 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.1992 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.12.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.12.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.1991 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1990 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1990 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.1990 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.1990 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.1990 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.02.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.1989 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.04.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.05.1987 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1986 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |