Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE61596T | 15.03.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86303666 | 14.05.1986 | US73694185 | 22.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0202859 | Global Dossier | 02.11.1995 | B2 | EP0202859 | 13.03.1991 | B1 | EP0202859 | 26.11.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73694185 | 22.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1263371 | 28.11.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US73694185 | 22.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3678033D1 | 18.04.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US73694185 | 22.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2563265B | 11.12.1996 | B2 | JPS61293207 | 24.12.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US73694185 | 22.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4579836 | 01.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US73694185 | 22.05.1985 |