Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 13.03.1991 | BE | | CH | Lapse: 13.03.1991 | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | LI | Lapse: 13.03.1991 | LU | Lapse: 31.05.1991 | NL | | SE | Lapse: 13.03.1991 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 04   M06  
Fee paid on  
31.07.1989 | European patent granted | 13.03.1991 | Opposition procedure | 01.09.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 24.05.1991 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 02.01.1996 | | Event description: | NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION | | Event date: | 01.02.1996 | | Event description: | NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE | | Event date: | 01.03.1996 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION | | Event date: | 26.11.1986 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 13.03.1991 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 02.11.1995 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 29.07.1987 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19870522 | | Event date: | 25.01.1989 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19881207 | | Event date: | 15.11.1990 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A. | | Event date: | 13.03.1991 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 61596 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19910315 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 18.04.1991 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3678033 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19910418 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 20.10.1995 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A. | | Event date: | 12.01.2000 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19990514 | | Event date: | 28.06.1991 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 30.11.1995 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH AEN | Code Expl.: | SCOPE OR VALIDITY OF THE PATENT MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM | | Event date: | 03.03.2000 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Event date: | 05.02.1992 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | BP CHEMICALS LIMITED | Effective DATE: | 19911210 | | Event date: | 01.04.1992 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | BP CHEMICALS LIMITED | | Event date: | 02.11.1995 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 19951102 | | Event date: | 30.11.1999 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | AMOCO CORP. | Effective DATE: | 19990531 | | Event date: | 01.02.2000 | | Event description: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19991201 | | Event date: | 13.03.1991 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Effective DATE: | 19910313 | | Event date: | 31.05.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990531 | | Event date: | 13.03.1991 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Effective DATE: | 19910313 | | Event date: | 01.03.2000 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20000301 | | Event date: | 31.01.2000 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20000131 | | Event date: | 14.05.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990514 | | Event date: | 13.03.1991 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Effective DATE: | 19910313 | | Event date: | 31.05.1991 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19910531 | | Event date: | 01.12.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19991201 | | Event date: | 13.03.1991 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Effective DATE: | 19910313 | | Event date: | 13.05.1998 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 19980513 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 21.04.1998 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19980421 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 20.04.1998 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19980420 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 27.04.1998 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19980427 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 30.04.1998 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 19980430 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 14.05.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20050514 | | Event date: | 15.09.1995 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Event date: | 26.01.1991 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 11.10.1986 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 15.09.1995 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Event date: | 17.12.1991 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |