EP0204460 - Carbonless system including solvent-only microcapsules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jerabek, Richard John 1001 Carter Drive Grand Island New York 14072 / US | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Townsend, Derek Thomas, et al Fry, Heath & Spence St. Georges House 6 Yattendon Road Horley Surrey RH6 7BS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Townsend, Derek Thomas, et al Fry, Heath & Spence St. Georges House 6 Yattendon Road Horley Surrey RH6 7BS / GB | ||
Former [1986/50] | Townsend, Derek Thomas Fry, Heath & Spence St. Georges House 6 Yattendon Road Horley Surrey RH6 7BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303790.9 | 19.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | US19850742113 | 05.06.1985 Original published format: US 742113 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204460 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204460 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/12 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
B41M5/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/50] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmaterial ohne Kohle mit nur Lösungsmittel enthaltenden Mikrokapseln | [1986/50] | English: | Carbonless system including solvent-only microcapsules | [1986/50] | French: | Matériau pour l'enregistrement sans carbone utilisant des microcapsules contenant uniquement un solvant | [1986/50] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 11.07.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.1986 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 | 19.06.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1253394 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]FR2028367 (CIBA GEIGY); | [A]DE3030478 (SCHNEIDER WALTER DR [DE]); | [A]US4397483 (HIRAISHI SHIGETOSHI [JP], et al) |