EP0202944 - Foam-filled thermal insulation panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Derrygate Limited Unit 3 Chancel Place Ham Lane Kingswinford West Midlands DY6 7JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states Derrygate Limited Unit 3 Chancel Place Ham Lane Kingswinford West Midlands DY6 7JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guy-Williams, Terrence James Van Dykes, Sytch Lane Wombourne, West Midlands / GB | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Russell, Paul Sidney, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Russell, Paul Sidney, et al Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303908.7 | 22.05.1986 | [1986/48] | Priority number, date | GB19850012992 | 22.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8512992 | [1986/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0202944 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0202944 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/26, E04B1/60 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
F16B5/0016 (EP);
E04B1/6129 (EP);
E04C2/292 (EP);
E04F2201/0115 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/48] | Title | German: | Mit Schaumkunststoff gefülltes Wärmedämmelement | [1986/48] | English: | Foam-filled thermal insulation panel | [1986/48] | French: | Panneau thermiquement isolant rempli de mousse | [1986/48] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/40] | 10.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3263386 (IRVINE KIMMEL); | [A]FR2245243 (REHAU PLASTIKS [DE]); | [A]USB104002I ; | [A]GB614394 (WILLIAM COOKSON, et al) |