EP0204482 - Precision control of the thickness of heat-softenable sheet material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Emhart Materials UK Limited 39 The Parade Lyn House Oadby Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
NL
TEXON FOOTWEAR INC. The Corporation Trust Company Corporate Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For:GB
Emhart Materials UK Limited 39 The Parade Lyn House Oadby Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
TEXON FOOTWEAR INC. The Corporation Trust Company Corporate Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | |||
Former [1990/17] | For:GB
Emhart Materials UK Limited 39 The Parade Lyn House Oadby Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 701, East Joppa Road Towson, Maryland 21204 / US | |||
Former [1988/10] | For:GB
Emhart Materials UK Limited 39 The Parade Lyn House Oadby Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
EMHART INDUSTRIES, INC. 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | |||
Former [1987/49] | For:GB
Emhart Materials UK Limited 39 The Parade Lyn House Oadby Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
EMHART ENTERPRISES CORP 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | |||
Former [1987/37] | For:GB
TEXON MATERIALS UK LIMITED Lyn House The Parade Oadby Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
EMHART ENTERPRISES CORP 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | |||
Former [1986/50] | For:GB
British United Shoe Machinery Limited Ross Walk Belgrave Leicester / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
USM Corporation 426 Colt Highway Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greatorex, Anthony Thomas Rutland House 1068 Melton Road Syston Leicestershire / GB | 02 /
Robbins Joseph 64 Stoneywell Road Bradgate View Leicester / GB | 03 /
Toon, Ernest Arthur 20 Rolleston Road Wigston Magna Leicestershire / GB | 04 /
Thompson, David Alan 119 Heathcote Drive Sileby Loughborough Leicestershire / GB | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Randall, John Walter, et al Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | [1990/22] |
Former [1986/50] | Wetters, Basil David Peter Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86303989.7 | 27.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | GB19850013345 | 28.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8513345 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204482 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204482 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/22, B29C43/52, // B29L7:00 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
B29C43/228 (EP,US);
B29C43/52 (EP,US);
B29C2043/483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/50] | Title | German: | Präzisionssteuerung der Dicke einer thermoplastischen Bahnmaterials | [1986/50] | English: | Precision control of the thickness of heat-softenable sheet material | [1986/50] | French: | Commande de précision de réglage de l'épaisseur d'une feuille en matière thermoplastique | [1986/50] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 17.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 30.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/11] | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0046526 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [X]DE2922152 (SANDVIK CONVEYOR GMBH); | [X]US3223027 (SHIGENARI SODA, et al) |