Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0205276 | Global Dossier | 26.08.1987 | A3 | EP0205276 | 17.12.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8513609 | 30.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2175929 | 10.12.1986 | A | GB8612859D0 | 02.07.1986 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8513609 | 30.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8513609D0 | 03.07.1985 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8513609 | 30.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6211736 | 20.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8513609 | 30.05.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO862143L | 01.12.1986 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8513609 | 30.05.1985 |