EP0205299 - Isatin derivatives, compositions containing the same, and the use thereof for ulcer diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kissei Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. No. 19-48 Yoshino Matsumoto-shi Nagano 399 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states Kissei Pharmaceutical Co Ltd No. 19-48 Yoshino Matsumoto-shi Nagano / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Michihiro 3158 Oaza Nakagawate akashina-machi Higashichikuma-gun Nagano / JP | 02 /
Tsukamoto, Tsutomu 1901-25 Oaza Kanbayashi Matsumoto-shi Nagano / JP | 03 /
Kitazawa, Makio 945 Oaza Yoshikawa hirata Matsumoto-shi Nagano / JP | 04 /
Yamomoto, Ryoji 3703-4 Oaza Kanbayashi Matsumoto-shi Nagano / JP | 05 /
Akahane, Masuo 5-416 Futaba Matsumoto-shi Nagano / JP | 06 /
Nakano, Yasushi 4997 Oaza Soga Shiojiri-shi Nagano / JP | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86304195.0 | 03.06.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | JP19850124919 | 08.06.1985 Original published format: JP 12491985 | [1986/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205299 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205299 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/40, C07D209/38, A61K31/40 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
C07D209/40 (EP,US);
C07D209/34 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | Isatinderivate, diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen und deren Anwendung gegen Geschwüre | [1986/51] | English: | Isatin derivatives, compositions containing the same, and the use thereof for ulcer diseases | [1986/51] | French: | Dérivés de l'isatine, compositions les contenant et leur utilisation dans le traitement des ulcères | [1986/51] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 03.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/27] | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3374234 (PRAKASH ARYA VISHWA) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 9, 29th August 1983, page 608, abstract no. 70513n, Columbus, Ohio, US; S.V. ZHAVRID et al.: "Synthesis of indole derivatives and their antimicrobial activity", & KHIM.-Farm. Zh. 1983, 17(2), 153-8 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, 1973, page 376, abstract no. 91459b, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.B. TOMCHIN et al.: "Heterocyclic semicarbazones and thiosemicarbazones. XXVIII. Isomerism of isatin beta-semicarbazone", & ZH. ORG. KHIM. 1973, 9(7), 1537-43 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, no. 22, 1973, page 303, abstract no. 41782f, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.B. TOMCHIN et al.: "Isomerism of isatin beta-thiosemicarbazones", & ZH. ORG. KHIM. 1973, 9(5), 1081-2 |