EP0206619 - Self-soldering, flexible circuit connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METCAL INC. 3704 Haven Court Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states METCAL INC. 3704 Haven Court Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kent, Harold B. 1337 Cordilleras Avenue San Carlos California 94070 / US | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Hayward, Denis Edward Peter, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86304393.1 | 09.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | US19850746796 | 20.06.1985 Original published format: US 746796 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206619 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206619 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0206619 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H01R9/07, H05K1/02 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
H05K3/363 (EP,US);
H05K1/0212 (EP,US);
H05K1/0242 (EP,US);
H05K2201/049 (EP,US);
H05K2201/056 (EP,US);
H05K2201/083 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10727 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1115 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1581 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1986/52] | H05K1/02, H05K3/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Selbstlötbare flexible Verbindung | [1986/52] | English: | Self-soldering, flexible circuit connector | [1986/52] | French: | Connecteur sous forme de circuit flexible autosoudable | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Request for further processing for: | 04.07.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.1993 | BE | 20.01.1993 | CH | 20.01.1993 | IT | 20.01.1993 | LI | 20.01.1993 | NL | 20.01.1993 | SE | 20.01.1993 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 20.01.1993 | |
BE | 20.01.1993 | ||
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
IT | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
SE | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 20.01.1993 | |
BE | 20.01.1993 | ||
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
SE | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
SE | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | CH | 20.01.1993 | |
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
NL | 20.01.1993 | ||
SE | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/32] | CH | 20.01.1993 | |
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
SE | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 20.01.1993 | |
LI | 20.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56161056 ; | [A]EP0006039 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2438925 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2134026 (ALLEN BRADLEY INT) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 9, no. 11, April 1967, page 1668 New York, USA; T.L. PALFI et al.: "Selective electrical heater system for module removal" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 10 (E-290)(1733), 17th January 1985; & JP-A- 56 161 056 (FUJI DENKI SOUGOU KENKYUSHO K.K.), & JP56161056 A 00000000 | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 9, no. 11, April 1967, page 1688, New York, US; T.L. PALFI et al.: "Selective electrical heater system for module removal". |