Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0207713 | Global Dossier | 11.09.1991 | B1 | EP0207713 | 23.12.1987 | A3 | EP0207713 | 07.01.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75115685 | 02.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1259185 | 12.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US75115685 | 02.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3681357D1 | 17.10.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75115685 | 02.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4636256 | 13.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75115685 | 02.07.1985 |